AL SB230 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-433.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-433.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, add'l type provided for, including resort areas, marinas, and restaurants meeting certain conditions, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Title
Community development districts, add'l type provided for, including resort areas, marinas, and restaurants meeting certain conditions, Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-433. |
2018-03-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Livingston motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 928 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 907 |
2018-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 906 |
2018-03-20 | House | Johnson (R) Amendment Offered |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 476 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 475 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Livingston Amendment Offered |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |