AL SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Assigned Act No. 2019-133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Assigned Act No. 2019-133.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sheriffs, co. jails, feeding of prisoners, fee increased, deposit in Prisoner Feeding Fund, increases provided every two years, continuous approp. from St. Gen Fund for emergency costs overruns, Secs. 14-6-40, 14-6-42, 14-6-47, 14-6-48, 36-22-17 am'd; Sec. 14-6-43 repealed
Title
Sheriffs, co. jails, feeding of prisoners, fee increased, deposit in Prisoner Feeding Fund, increases provided every two years, continuous approp. from St. Gen Fund for emergency costs overruns, Secs. 14-6-40, 14-6-42, 14-6-47, 14-6-48, 36-22-17 am'd; Sec. 14-6-43 repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-133. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 489 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 446 |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 445 |
2019-04-30 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2019-04-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 253 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |