AL SB226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, High Socks for Hope, Inc., exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, High Socks for Hope, Inc., exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HousePending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
2019-05-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2019-05-23SenateEngrossed
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1139
2019-05-23SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1138
2019-05-23SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback