AL SB226 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lodging tax, rooms and spaces not used for overnight accomodations, exemption, consistent with rule of Revenue Dept., Sec. 40-26-1 am'd.
Title
Lodging tax, rooms and spaces not used for overnight accomodations, exemption, consistent with rule of Revenue Dept., Sec. 40-26-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 618 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |