AL SB226 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ad valorem taxes, homestead exemption for retired due to disability, Secs. 40-9-19, 40-9-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem taxes, homestead exemption for retired due to disability, Secs. 40-9-19, 40-9-21 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2017-05-09SenatePittman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-09SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-03-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback