AL SB226 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-442.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wallace-Folsom College Savings Investment Plan, named changed to Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, provide the Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) program, definitions relating to ABLE, provide tax exemptions, appropriations for development of ABLE program, Secs. 16-33C-1, 16-33C-2, 16-33C-2.1, 16-33C-3, 16-33C-4, 16-33C-5, 16-33C-10, 16-33C-11, 16-33C-12, 40-18-19 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wallace-Folsom College Savings Investment Plan, named changed to Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, provide the Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) program, definitions relating to ABLE, provide tax exemptions, appropriations for development of ABLE program, Secs. 16-33C-1, 16-33C-2, 16-33C-2.1, 16-33C-3, 16-33C-4, 16-33C-5, 16-33C-10, 16-33C-11, 16-33C-12, 40-18-19 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-442.
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenatePassed Second House
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1241
2015-06-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2015-04-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 295
2015-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback