AL SB224 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Salvage vehicles, secondary metals recyclers may acquire without title under certain conditions, statement of ownership, value, and identifying characterists required, lien verification system provided by Revenue Department, penalties, Sec. 32-8-64.2 added; Sec. 32-8-87, 40-12-412, 40-12-116 am'd.; Act 2010-748, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2011-21065)
Title
Salvage vehicles, secondary metals recyclers may acquire without title under certain conditions, statement of ownership, value, and identifying characterists required, lien verification system provided by Revenue Department, penalties, Sec. 32-8-64.2 added; Sec. 32-8-87, 40-12-412, 40-12-116 am'd.; Act 2010-748, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2011-21065)
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-633. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1038 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1138 | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1137 | |
2011-06-02 | Treadaway Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136 | |
2011-06-02 | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute resumed | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Wood motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-01 | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 740 | |
2011-05-25 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 739 | |
2011-05-25 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities first Substitute Offered | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |