AL SB221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-478.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-478.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Dept., to create Deputy Commissioner of Prison Rehabilitation within Dept. of Corrections, to create Deputy Director for Parolee Rehabilitation within Board of Pardons and Paroles, to create the Study Commission on Interagency Cooperation and Collaboration on the Rehabilitation and Reintegration of Formerly Incarcerated Individuals and to provide for its duties, to provide for membership, Sec. 14-1-1.5 am'd.
Title
Corrections Dept., to create Deputy Commissioner of Prison Rehabilitation within Dept. of Corrections, to create Deputy Director for Parolee Rehabilitation within Board of Pardons and Paroles, to create the Study Commission on Interagency Cooperation and Collaboration on the Rehabilitation and Reintegration of Formerly Incarcerated Individuals and to provide for its duties, to provide for membership, Sec. 14-1-1.5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1458 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1212 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1211 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 927 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 926 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 925 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1212 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1211 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 927 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 926 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 925 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-478. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1458 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Wheeler intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1212 |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1211 |
2021-05-17 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 926 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |