AL SB215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Employees' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump-sum additional payment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees' Retirement System, retirees, one-time lump-sum additional payment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-355.
2018-03-15SenateEnrolled
2018-03-15HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-15HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-15SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 808
2018-03-15SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 733
2018-03-13HouseRich Amendment Offered
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 732
2018-03-13HouseWays and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-02-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2018-02-27SenateEngrossed
2018-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509
2018-02-27SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508
2018-02-27SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB215&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB215-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB215-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192305-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590876&VOTE=508&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590877&VOTE=509&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595159&VOTE=732&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595172&VOTE=733&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=595173&VOTE=734&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596193&VOTE=808&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback