AL SB214 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to motor vehicles; to amend Section 32-6-65, Code of Alabama 1975; to define "centralized motor vehicle registration"; to allow for certain data collection; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Title
Relating to motor vehicles; to amend Section 32-6-65, Code of Alabama 1975; to define "centralized motor vehicle registration"; to allow for certain data collection; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt 924LPP-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt 924LPP-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported Favorably from House State Government |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to Committee to House State Government |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Adopt 924LPP-1 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate County and Municipal Government 924LPP-1 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate County and Municipal Government |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |