AL SB214 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, distinctive license plate, owners may authorize release of personal information to sponsoring organization,including colleges, Secs. 32-6-64, 32--6-67 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, distinctive license plate, owners may authorize release of personal information to sponsoring organization,including colleges, Secs. 32-6-64, 32--6-67 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-190.
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-06SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 584
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed
2018-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 262
2018-02-01SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 261
2018-02-01SenateGovernmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 substitute
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback