AL SB21 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-493.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teachers' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump sum funded payment based on years of service, payment in Fiscal Year 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' Retirement System, retirees and beneficiaries, one-time lump sum funded payment based on years of service, payment in Fiscal Year 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-493.
2018-03-28HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-28HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1221
2018-03-28SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1220
2018-03-28SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-27HouseJackson intended to vote "Abstain"
2018-03-27HouseShiver and Jackson filed conflict of interest
2018-03-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1070
2018-03-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1069
2018-03-27HouseRowe Amendment Offered
2018-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-27HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-02-27SenateEngrossed
2018-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 512
2018-02-27SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 511
2018-02-27SenateDial first Substitute Offered
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB21&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB21-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB21-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB21-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192299-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193281-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590889&VOTE=511&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590890&VOTE=512&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601731&VOTE=1069&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601736&VOTE=1070&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602061&VOTE=1220&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602062&VOTE=1221&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback