AL SB209 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, tax credit for private intrastate adoptions, applicable to any private adoptions, Secs. 40-18-360, 40-18-361 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, tax credit for private intrastate adoptions, applicable to any private adoptions, Secs. 40-18-360, 40-18-361 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-549.
2018-03-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled
2018-03-27HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-27SenateBrewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1166
2018-03-27SenateBrewbaker to Carry Over Adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-27SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1057
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1056
2018-03-22HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-02-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 315
2018-02-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback