AL SB204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2017-260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military justice, Alabama Code of Military Justice conformance with the federal Uniform Code of Military Justice, Secs. 31-2A-2, 31-2A-5, 31-2A-17, 31-2A-26, 31-2A-32, 31-2A-46, 31-2A-47, 31-2A-52 am'd.
Title
Military justice, Alabama Code of Military Justice conformance with the federal Uniform Code of Military Justice, Secs. 31-2A-2, 31-2A-5, 31-2A-17, 31-2A-26, 31-2A-32, 31-2A-46, 31-2A-47, 31-2A-52 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-260. |
2017-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 295 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |