AL SB203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Securities, registration fees for agents and investment advisor representative increased, filing fees for certain management investment companies revised, Secs. 8-6-3, 8-6-10 am'd.
Title
Securities, registration fees for agents and investment advisor representative increased, filing fees for certain management investment companies revised, Secs. 8-6-3, 8-6-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-275. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 718 |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 434 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |