AL SB202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Judiciary second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Judiciary second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal charges or convictions for certain felony or misdemeanor offenses, petition for expungement of records authorized under certain conditions, procedures
Title
Criminal charges or convictions for certain felony or misdemeanor offenses, petition for expungement of records authorized under certain conditions, procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Bedford motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Judiciary second Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary with 2 amendments |
2013-05-09 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Bedford Table Bedford to reconsider |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 447 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 446 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Taylor motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 445 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Taylor Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Sanford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 444 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Bedford first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Bedford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Bedford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 443 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |