AL SB200 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-146.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program, revise definitions, create a review committee, Secs. 20-2-211, 20-2-212, 20-2-214, 20-2-215 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Monitoring Program, revise definitions, create a review committee, Secs. 20-2-211, 20-2-212, 20-2-214, 20-2-215 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-146.
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled
2018-02-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-27SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2018-02-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 245
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback