AL SB2 | 2019 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 5 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 5 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Joint Transportation Committee, technical corrections regarding Dept. of Transportation's long-range plan, long-range plan clarified, clarification of the Alabama Dept.of Transportation's duties and information requirements to the committee relating to the long-range plan, Sections 29-2-1, 29-2-2, 29-2-3, 29-2-4, 29-2-6, and 29-2-8 am'd.
Title
Permanent Joint Transportation Committee, technical corrections regarding Dept. of Transportation's long-range plan, long-range plan clarified, clarification of the Alabama Dept.of Transportation's duties and information requirements to the committee relating to the long-range plan, Sections 29-2-1, 29-2-2, 29-2-3, 29-2-4, 29-2-6, and 29-2-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Pending third reading on day 5 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 18 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Roberts Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 17 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 16 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Jones Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Chambliss first Substitute Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Reed Carry Over Chair Adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |