AL SB199 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to crimes and offenses; to prohibit an individual from picketing or protesting in certain circumstances; to allow counties and municipalities to adopt ordinances or regulations regarding time and noise regulations in certain circumstances; to provide criminal penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose of effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to crimes and offenses; to prohibit an individual from picketing or protesting in certain circumstances; to allow counties and municipalities to adopt ordinances or regulations regarding time and noise regulations in certain circumstances; to provide criminal penalties for violations; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose of effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt 6PAV3Z-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt MZN9HW-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt 6PAV3Z-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt MZN9HW-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Adopt 6PAV3Z-1 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Adopt MZN9HW-1 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |