AL SB194 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University of Alabama, Board of Trustees, congressional districts for membership as constituted on 1/1/2018, State Superintendent of Education removed from membership, age restriction of 70 deleted, Section 264 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Title
University of Alabama, Board of Trustees, congressional districts for membership as constituted on 1/1/2018, State Superintendent of Education removed from membership, age restriction of 70 deleted, Section 264 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, am'd, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-132. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-22 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 445 |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 194 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |