AL SB193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to various school systems and colleges and universities, and other entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1147 (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1301 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1185 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 976 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 975 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Poole motion to Adopt Roll Call 974 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 679 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1301 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1185 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 976 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 975 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Poole motion to Adopt Roll Call 974 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 681 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 680 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 679 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2021-05-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-420. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 4:23 p.m. on May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2021-05-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2021-05-06 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1147 |
2021-05-06 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1301 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1185 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 976 |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 975 |
2021-04-27 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 681 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 680 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB303 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education