AL SB192 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-250.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Agriculture and Conservation Development Commission, allocation of funds to soil and water conservation districts, minimum deleted, Sec. 9-8A-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture and Conservation Development Commission, allocation of funds to soil and water conservation districts, minimum deleted, Sec. 9-8A-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-250.
2018-03-08HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 199
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback