AL SB190 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2016 First Special Session, 2017 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Title
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2016 First Special Session, 2017 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1001 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 356 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |