AL SB19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, optional standard deduction amount and adjusted gross income range allowable for maximum optional standard deduction and dependent exemption, increased, Secs. 40-18-15, 40-18-19 am'd.
Title
Income tax, optional standard deduction amount and adjusted gross income range allowable for maximum optional standard deduction and dependent exemption, increased, Secs. 40-18-15, 40-18-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 997 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 132 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 131 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 130 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 132 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 131 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 130 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-292. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 997 |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 132 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 131 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 18 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 18 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |