AL SB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School discipline, hearing required for student expulsion or long-term suspension, expulsion and suspension prohibited in certain circumstances, Sec. 16-1-14 am'd.
Title
School discipline, hearing required for student expulsion or long-term suspension, expulsion and suspension prohibited in certain circumstances, Sec. 16-1-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 407 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 406 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 405 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |