AL SB189 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Financial Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, certain contributions to savings accounts by guardians and conservators, authorized, Secs. 16-33C-1, 16-33C-3, 16-33C-10,16-33C-25 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, certain contributions to savings accounts by guardians and conservators, authorized, Secs. 16-33C-1, 16-33C-3, 16-33C-10,16-33C-25 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HousePending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Financial Services
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
2018-02-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 346
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08SenateBrewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback