AL SB188 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Assigned Act No. 2021-330.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public education employees, including K-12, postsecondary education, and AIDB, salary increase

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public education employees, including K-12, postsecondary education, and AIDB, salary increase

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 970 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Poole motion to Adopt Roll Call 969 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 683 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 682 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-330.
2021-04-27HouseSignature Requested
2021-04-27SenateEnrolled
2021-04-27SenatePassed Second House
2021-04-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 970
2021-04-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-04-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2021-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683
2021-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-03-16SenateReported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable
2021-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB188&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB188-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB188-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209673-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209904-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41867.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41576.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42397.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42808.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653203&VOTE=682&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB188&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653205&VOTE=683&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=661058&VOTE=969&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB188&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=661091&VOTE=970&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback