AL SB185 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees, cost-of-living increase for fiscal year beginning October 1, 2018.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
2018-02-20SenateFurther Consideration
2018-02-20SenatePittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback