AL SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission, education requirement to become a law enforcement officer amended to include nonpublic education, Sec. 36-21-46 am'd.
Title
Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission, education requirement to become a law enforcement officer amended to include nonpublic education, Sec. 36-21-46 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 11 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |