AL SB184 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Product liability action for relief against sellers that are not manufacturers, prohibited, Secs. 6-5-501, 6-5-521 am'd. (2011-20347)
Title
Product liability action for relief against sellers that are not manufacturers, prohibited, Secs. 6-5-501, 6-5-521 am'd. (2011-20347)
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Holmes motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-31 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 24 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Holmes motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2011-05-31 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 24 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-627. | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977 | |
2011-05-31 | Holmes motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 976 | |
2011-05-31 | Holmes motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 975 | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 326 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325 | |
2011-04-19 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |