AL SB181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2021-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Assigned Act No. 2021-78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial institutions, elderly or vulnerable adults, refusal or delay in execution of certain financial transactions authorized when financial exploitation may have occurred or attempted
Title
Financial institutions, elderly or vulnerable adults, refusal or delay in execution of certain financial transactions authorized when financial exploitation may have occurred or attempted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 215 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Blackshear motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 215 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Blackshear motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 215 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 214 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-78. |
2021-03-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB147 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Blackshear motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote