AL SB181 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-389.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Religious freedom provided for, right to worship, display of Ten Commandments on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious freedom provided for, right to worship, display of Ten Commandments on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-389.
2018-03-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled
2018-03-27SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1015
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2018-02-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 524
2018-02-27SenateDial motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-27SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections Amendment Offered
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback