AL SB175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2022-139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2022-139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education Trust Fund Rolling Reserve Act, to allow Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to be used for capital outlay, Sec. 29-9-4 am'd.
Title
Education Trust Fund Rolling Reserve Act, to allow Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to be used for capital outlay, Sec. 29-9-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 481 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 480 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 331 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 330 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 480 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 331 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 330 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-139. |
2022-03-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 481 |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 331 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |