AL SB175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2018, approp. to Corrections Dept., Departmental Emergency Fund, and Forensic Sciences Dept.
Title
Supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2018, approp. to Corrections Dept., Departmental Emergency Fund, and Forensic Sciences Dept.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-262. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 716 |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 590 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 589 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |