AL SB175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales and use tax, exemption from the sale of certain adaptive devises for the blind
Title
Taxation, sales and use tax, exemption from the sale of certain adaptive devises for the blind
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 596 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hightower motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 595 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hightower motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 594 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |