AL SB175 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substance prescription database, Class II to Class V controlled substances, reporting of dispensing, veterinarians exempt from report, Sec. 20-2-213 am'd.
Title
Controlled substance prescription database, Class II to Class V controlled substances, reporting of dispensing, veterinarians exempt from report, Sec. 20-2-213 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health |
2015-06-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 531 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Stutts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |