AL SB171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Forwarded to Governor on April 14, 2010 at 5:02 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Forwarded to Governor on April 14, 2010 at 5:02 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electrical Contractors, Board of, definitions, terms, executive director and officers provided for, compensation increased, expired licenses restoration fee, investigations, appeals, certain written tests required for licensure, continuing education, inactive status, civil fines, penalties, board subject to Sunset Law, Secs. 34-36-1, 34-36-3, 34-36-4, 34-36-5, 34-36-6, 34-36-7, 34-36-8, 34-36-9, 34-36-13, 34-36-15, 34-36-16, 34-36-17 am'd.; Sec. 34-36-14 repealed (2010-20497)
Title
Electrical Contractors, Board of, definitions, terms, executive director and officers provided for, compensation increased, expired licenses restoration fee, investigations, appeals, certain written tests required for licensure, continuing education, inactive status, civil fines, penalties, board subject to Sunset Law, Secs. 34-36-1, 34-36-3, 34-36-4, 34-36-5, 34-36-6, 34-36-7, 34-36-8, 34-36-9, 34-36-13, 34-36-15, 34-36-16, 34-36-17 am'd.; Sec. 34-36-14 repealed (2010-20497)
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Forwarded to Governor on April 14, 2010 at 5:02 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-540. | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-14 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1086 | |
2010-04-14 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1067 | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1066 | |
2010-04-14 | Boards and Commissions first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Guin to suspend rules to take up out of order adopted voice vote | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 380 | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 379 | |
2010-02-23 | Marsh first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-23 | Marsh tabled Governmental Affairs Amendment No. 2 Roll Call 378. | |
2010-02-23 | Marsh tabled Governmental Affairs Amendment | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Marsh requested unanimous consent in order to carry over Call of the Chair Granted | |
2010-02-16 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-16 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered. | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |