AL SB171 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Scottsboro, alcoholic beverages, city council to regulate hours for Sunday sales

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scottsboro, alcoholic beverages, city council to regulate hours for Sunday sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2015-03-17 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19SenateDelivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 19, 2015
2015-03-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-21.
2015-03-19HouseSignature Requested
2015-03-19SenateEnrolled
2015-03-19SenatePassed Second House
2015-03-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141
2015-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-17HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2015-03-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92
2015-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback