AL SB169 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to municipalities; to amend Section 11-51-90.1, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the municipal business license tax; to specify that the definition of gross receipts does not include any excise tax imposed by the federal, state, and local governments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to municipalities; to amend Section 11-51-90.1, Code of Alabama 1975, relating to the municipal business license tax; to specify that the definition of gross receipts does not include any excise tax imposed by the federal, state, and local governments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-17HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-17HouseReported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government
2023-05-17HouseAmendment/Substitute by House County and Municipal Government AL8CQQ-1
2023-05-10HouseCarry Over by House County and Municipal Government
2023-05-02HouseReferred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government
2023-05-02SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-02SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-02SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-18SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-18SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-18SenateReported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government
2023-04-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate County and Municipal Government
2023-04-05SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback