AL SB160 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to Bullock County; to further provide for the compensation of the judge of probate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Bullock County; to further provide for the compensation of the judge of probate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 86 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25SenateEnacted
2023-04-25SenateEnrolled
2023-04-25HouseReady to Enroll
2023-04-25HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-25HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-04-20HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-04-20HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-04-20HouseReported Favorably from House Local Legislation
2023-04-18HouseReferred to Committee to House Local Legislation
2023-04-18SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-18SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-18SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-13SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Local Legislation
2023-04-04SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback