AL SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Assigned Act No. 2021-461.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cottage food production operations, allow online sales, remove gross receipts cap, require certain nutrition information to be included on product labels, Sec. 22-20-5.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cottage food production operations, allow online sales, remove gross receipts cap, require certain nutrition information to be included on product labels, Sec. 22-20-5.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1134 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 1133 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 315 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 314 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 313 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2021-461.
2021-05-06HouseSignature Requested
2021-05-06SenateEnrolled
2021-05-06SenatePassed Second House
2021-05-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134
2021-05-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-03-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2021-03-02SenateEngrossed
2021-03-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 315
2021-03-02SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 314
2021-03-02SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22205.1Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB160&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB160-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB160-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB160-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210979-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41673.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42341.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=648108&VOTE=313&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB160&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=648111&VOTE=314&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=648112&VOTE=315&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663824&VOTE=1133&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB160&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=663826&VOTE=1134&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback