AL SB160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Title
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-117. |
2020-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 472 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 456 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |