AL SB160 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on April 24, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on April 24, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, authorized to participate in meetings by telephone or video conference under certain conditions
Title
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, authorized to participate in meetings by telephone or video conference under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on April 24, 2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Assigned Act No. 2012-264. | |
2012-04-24 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-24 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 337 | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |