AL SB158 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elmore Co., sheriff, compensation, Act 2003-174, 2003 Reg. Sess., repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elmore Co., sheriff, compensation, Act 2003-174, 2003 Reg. Sess., repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Ingram motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-189.
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-06SenateSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-03-01HouseIngram motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 579
2018-03-01HouseHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2018-02-27SenateBrewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 503
2018-02-27SenateExecutive Amendment Offered
2018-02-27SenateForwarded to Governor
2018-02-20HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-20SenateEnrolled
2018-02-20SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 341
2018-02-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2018-02-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283
2018-02-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateWaggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-01SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback