AL SB155 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the Board of Medical Examiners; to amend Sections 34-24-50.1 and 34-24-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide further for qualifications for licensure as a physician; and to add Section 34-24-75.2 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the board to issue permits for certain medical school graduates to practice medicine in a limited capacity for a limited time as bridge year graduate physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Board of Medical Examiners; to amend Sections 34-24-50.1 and 34-24-70, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide further for qualifications for licensure as a physician; and to add Section 34-24-75.2 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the board to issue permits for certain medical school graduates to practice medicine in a limited capacity for a limited time as bridge year graduate physicians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt KO9S5U-1 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateEnacted
2023-05-11SenateEnrolled
2023-05-11SenateConcur In and Adopt
2023-05-09HouseRead a Third Time and Pass as Amended
2023-05-09HouseAdopt KO9S5U-1
2023-05-09HouseOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-03HouseRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-03HouseReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-03HouseReported Favorably from House Health
2023-04-27HouseReferred to Committee to House Health
2023-04-27SenateRead First Time in Second House
2023-04-27SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-04-27SenateOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-13SenateRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-12SenateReported Favorably from Senate Healthcare
2023-04-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to Senate Healthcare
2023-04-04SenateRead First Time in House of Origin

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB155-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/SB155-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/KO9S5U-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-A1A1SS-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-A1A1SS-2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc436
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc631
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc632
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc645

Bill Comments

feedback