AL SB154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-471.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-471.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Toll roads and bridges, Toll Road, Bridge and Tunnel Authority, state and local tax exemptions further provided, Secs. 23-2-142, 23-2-153 am'd.
Title
Toll roads and bridges, Toll Road, Bridge and Tunnel Authority, state and local tax exemptions further provided, Secs. 23-2-142, 23-2-153 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 74 N: 10 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Wilcox motion to Table (Y: 41 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - Wilcox motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Wilcox motion to Table (Y: 41 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - Wilcox motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-471. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1133 |
2019-05-29 | House | Wilcox motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1132 |
2019-05-29 | House | Bracy 2nd Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | House | Bracy and Alexander intended to vote "Nay" |
2019-05-29 | House | Wilcox motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1131 |
2019-05-29 | House | Bracy 1st Amendment Offered |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1063 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 959 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Transportation and Energy zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Elliott motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |