AL SB15 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Legislature, House or Senate, vacancies, after Oct 1 of third year, seat to remain vacant until next term, Sec. 46 repealed and replaced, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature, House or Senate, vacancies, after Oct 1 of third year, seat to remain vacant until next term, Sec. 46 repealed and replaced, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-276.
2018-03-21HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-21SenateEnrolled
2018-03-21SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 926
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed
2018-03-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 576
2018-03-01SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 575
2018-03-01SenateGlover first Substitute Offered
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB15&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB15-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB15-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192540-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591735&VOTE=575&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591736&VOTE=576&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598194&VOTE=926&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback