AL SB145 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Jury trials, six member juries authorized in certain criminal proceedings and certain civil cases in which the amount in controversy does not exceed $50,000, Sec. 12-16-100, 12-16-101, 12-16-140 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury trials, six member juries authorized in certain criminal proceedings and certain civil cases in which the amount in controversy does not exceed $50,000, Sec. 12-16-100, 12-16-101, 12-16-140 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2015-03-19SenateEngrossed
2015-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 170
2015-03-18SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 169
2015-03-18SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2015-03-18SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 168
2015-03-18SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2015-03-18SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-03-18SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2015-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback