AL SB144 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, liens, release of after four years for specified older vehicles, Sec. 32-8-64.2 am'd
Title
Motor vehicles, liens, release of after four years for specified older vehicles, Sec. 32-8-64.2 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-224. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1130 |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 592 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Bedford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 591 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Bedford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |