AL SB141 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military, and certain federal employees, including spouses, occupational licensing boards, date extended to implement, time extended for temporary permits to practice, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military, and certain federal employees, including spouses, occupational licensing boards, date extended to implement, time extended for temporary permits to practice, Sec. 31-1-6 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-24 - Senate - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 440 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 308 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 307 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Moore (P) motion to Adopt Roll Call 306 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 248 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 247 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2022-92.
2022-03-01HouseSignature Requested
2022-03-01SenateEnrolled
2022-02-24HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2022-02-24SenateButler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 440
2022-02-24SenateConcurrence Requested
2022-02-24HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308
2022-02-24HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 307
2022-02-24HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered
2022-02-24HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2022-02-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
2022-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 248
2022-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-02-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-02-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3116Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB141&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB141-Int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB141-Enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/218058-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43496.htm
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43880.htm
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43911.htm
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44624.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=674574&VOTE=247&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB141&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=674576&VOTE=248&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677720&VOTE=306&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB141&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677726&VOTE=307&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677745&VOTE=308&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677972&VOTE=440&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback